Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Fady, M. Afr. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Lilongwe, Malawi


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Jun 1899Born
28 Jun 192526.0Ordained PriestPriest of Missionaries of Africa (White Fathers)
10 Jul 195152.0AppointedVicar Apostolic of Likuni, Malawi
10 Jul 195152.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Abaradira
9 Sep 195152.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Abaradira
25 Apr 195959.8AppointedBishop of Lilongwe, Malawi
6 May 197272.9ResignedBishop of Lilongwe, Malawi
22 Jun 198485.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Lilongwe, Malawi

MicroData Summary for Joseph Fady (VIAF: 2469985)
Bishop Joseph Fady M. Afr. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Lilongwe

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSoppe-le-Haut, France

  • a priest for 58.9 years
  • a bishop for 32.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1951, Number 88

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast