Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Eugen Joseph Frans Vroemen, S.M.M. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Chikwawa, Malawi


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Mar 1910Born
20 Feb 193726.9Ordained PriestPriest of Missionaries of the Company of Mary
22 Mar 196555.0AppointedBishop of Chikwawa, Malawi
5 Jun 196555.2Ordained BishopBishop of Chikwawa, Malawi
12 Feb 197968.9ResignedBishop of Chikwawa, Malawi
27 Jul 199282.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Chikwawa, Malawi

MicroData Summary for Eugen Joseph Frans Vroemen
Bishop Eugen Joseph Frans Vroemen S.M.M. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Chikwawa

EventPlace
Birth PlaceElsloo, Netherlands

  • a priest for 55.4 years
  • a bishop for 27.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 133

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast