Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Felix Eugenio Mkhori

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Lilongwe


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Aug 1931BornNtenje
8 Sep 196130.0Ordained PriestPriest
29 Sep 197746.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Chikwawa, Malawi
29 Sep 197746.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Sicca Veneria
8 Jan 197846.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sicca Veneria
12 Feb 197947.5AppointedBishop of Chikwawa, Malawi
23 Jan 200169.4AppointedBishop of Lilongwe, Malawi
4 Jul 200775.9RetiredBishop of Lilongwe, Malawi
27 Oct 201281.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Lilongwe, Malawi

MicroData Summary for Felix Eugenio Mkhori:
Bishop Felix Eugenio Mkhori (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Lilongwe

  • a priest for 51.1 years
  • a bishop for 34.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 4 Jul 2007
  • d: CB, 27 Oct 2012
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 212, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013