Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Mukasa Zuza

Deceased

Bishop of Mzuzu


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Oct 1955BornMalembo
25 Jul 198226.8Ordained PriestPriest of Mzuzu, Malawi
3 Mar 199539.4AppointedBishop of Mzuzu, Malawi
6 May 199539.5Ordained BishopBishop of Mzuzu, Malawi
15 Jan 201559.2DiedBishop of Mzuzu, Malawi

MicroData Summary for Joseph Mukasa Zuza:
Bishop Joseph Mukasa Zuza (born , died ) Bishop of Mzuzu

  • a priest for 32.4 years
  • a bishop for 19.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 142, Number 12,547
  • d: CB, 15 Jan 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015