Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giuseppe Leanza

Apostolic Nuncio to Czech Republic

Titular Archbishop of Lilybaeum


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Jan 1943 BornCesarò, Italy
17 Jul 196623.5Ordained PriestPriest
3 Jul 199047.5AppointedTitular Archbishop of Lilybaeum
3 Jul 199047.5AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Haiti
22 Sep 199047.7Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Lilybaeum
4 Jun 199148.4AppointedApostolic Pro-Nuncio to Malawi
4 Jun 199148.4AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Zambia
29 Apr 199956.3AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Bosnia-Herzegovina
15 May 200259.4AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Slovenia
18 May 200259.4AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Macedonia
22 Feb 200360.1AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Bulgaria
22 Feb 200865.1AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Ireland
15 Sep 201168.7AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Czech Republic

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Leanza:
Archbishop Giuseppe Leanza (born ) Apostolic Nuncio of Czech Republic

Please contact the Archbishop through the Nunciature to Czech Republic.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 22 Feb 2008
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 123, Number 11,080
  • ab: Bollettino, 15 Sep 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 129, Number 11,594
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 152, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013