Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Noel Charles O’Regan, S.M.A.

Bishop Emeritus of Ndola, Zambia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Dec 1941 Born
18 Dec 196726.0Ordained PriestPriest of Society of African Missions
10 Jul 199553.5AppointedBishop of Solwezi, Zambia
10 Dec 199553.9Ordained BishopBishop of Solwezi, Zambia
1 Oct 200462.7AppointedBishop of Ndola, Zambia
16 Jan 201068.0ResignedBishop of Ndola, Zambia

MicroData Summary for Noel Charles O’Regan
Bishop Noel Charles O’Regan S.M.A. (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Ndola

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBishopstown, Ireland

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Ndola.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 16 Jan 2010
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 144, Number 12,671

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018