Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Ndola

Dioecesis Ndolaensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Alick Banda, Bishop
  • Noel Charles O’Regan, S.M.A., Bishop Emeritus

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Elevated: 25 April 1959
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Lusaka
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Zambia
  • Square Kilometers: 32,000 (12,360 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: 445 Evelyn Crescent, P.O. Box 70244, Ndola, Zambia
  • Telephone: (02)61.24.11; 61.40.13
  • Fax: 62.06.30

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Prefecture Apostolic of Ndola
8 January 1938ErectedPrefecture Apostolic of Broken Hill Prefecture Apostolic of Ndola (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Ndola
13 January 1949ElevatedPrefecture Apostolic of Ndola Vicariate Apostolic of Ndola
9 April 1959Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Ndola Prefecture Apostolic of Solwezi (erected)
Diocese of Ndola
25 April 1959ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Ndola Diocese of Ndola

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Vicariate Apostolic of Ndola
195029,143261,00011.2%25251,165323815ap1951
Diocese of Ndola
1970138,375815,00017.0%48482,88258107ap1971
1980723,0002,065,00035.0%5667110,1838310571ap1981
1990937,0002,786,00033.6%29901197,87311513585ap1991
1999800,0002,000,00040.0%3167988,1639518969ap2000
2000750,0002,000,00037.5%31701017,42510119469ap2001
2001750,0002,000,00037.5%31721037,28110719569ap2002
2002750,0002,000,00037.5%30721027,35212719569ap2003
2003750,0002,000,00037.5%2672987,65310719569ap2004
2004850,0002,000,00042.5%3068988,67312120169ap2005

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2012
code: v2.7.8, 18 Feb 2012; data: 14 Apr 2012