Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Alick Banda

Archbishop of Lusaka, Zambia

Apostolic Administrator of Ndola


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Nov 1963 Born
7 Aug 199430.7Ordained PriestPriest of Ndola, Zambia
30 May 200743.5AppointedBishop of Solwezi, Zambia
29 Jul 200743.7Ordained BishopBishop of Solwezi, Zambia
13 Nov 200945.9AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Ndola, Zambia
16 Jan 201046.1SucceededBishop of Ndola, Zambia
30 Jan 201854.2AppointedArchbishop of Lusaka, Zambia
30 Jan 201854.2AppointedApostolic Administrator of Ndola, Zambia
14 Apr 201854.4InstalledArchbishop of Lusaka, Zambia

MicroData Summary for Alick Banda (VIAF: 56859412)
Archbishop Alick Banda (born ) Archbishop of Lusaka

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMufulira
Ordained BishopOpen Air in front of, Saint Daniel, Cathedral, Solwezi, Diocese of Solwezi

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Lusaka.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 30 May 2007
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 190, Number 15,485
  • ab: Bollettino, 14 Nov 2009
  • s: Bollettino, 16 Jan 2010
  • ab: Bollettino, 30 Jan 2018
  • i: CB, 9 Apr 2018
  • aadm: CB, 3 Jan 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast