Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paul Francis Duffy, O.M.I. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Mongu


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Jul 1932BornNorwood, MA, USA
22 Dec 196230.4Ordained PriestPriest of Oblates of Mary Immaculate
14 Jun 199764.8AppointedBishop of Mongu, Zambia
31 Aug 199765.0Ordained BishopBishop of Mongu, Zambia
15 Feb 201178.5RetiredBishop of Mongu, Zambia
23 Aug 201179.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Mongu, Zambia

MicroData Summary for Paul Francis Duffy:
Bishop Paul Francis Duffy O.M.I. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Mongu

  • a priest for 48.6 years
  • a bishop for 13.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 15 Feb 2011
  • d: CB, 24 Aug 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 150, Number 13,141
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 208, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015