Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Valentine Kalumba, O.M.I.

Bishop of Livingstone


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Jan 1967 BornMufulira
20 Feb 200538.0Professed (Perpetual Vows)Member of Oblates of Mary Immaculate
22 Oct 200538.7Ordained PriestPriest of Oblates of Mary Immaculate
18 Jun 201649.4AppointedBishop of Livingstone, Zambia
3 Sep 201649.6Ordained BishopBishop of Livingstone, Zambia

MicroData Summary for Valentine Kalumba
Bishop Valentine Kalumba O.M.I. (born ) Bishop of Livingstone

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Livingstone.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 18 Jun 2016
  • ob: CB, 24 Jun 2016
  • c1+: CB, 5 Aug 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 4 Sep 2016