Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Raymond Mpezele

Bishop Emeritus of Livingstone, Zambia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 May 1939 Born
7 Sep 196930.3Ordained PriestPriest
3 May 198545.9AppointedBishop of Livingstone, Zambia
7 Jul 198546.1Ordained BishopBishop of Livingstone, Zambia
18 Jun 201677.1RetiredBishop of Livingstone, Zambia

MicroData Summary for Raymond Mpezele
Bishop Raymond Mpezele (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Livingstone

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBulanda

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Livingstone.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 18 Jun 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast