Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Elias White Mutale

Deceased

Archbishop of Kasama, Zambia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Nov 1929Born
6 Sep 196434.7Ordained PriestPriest of Kasama, Zambia
3 Jul 197141.6AppointedBishop of Mansa, Zambia
12 Sep 197141.8Ordained BishopBishop of Mansa, Zambia
17 Sep 197343.8AppointedArchbishop of Kasama, Zambia
12 Feb 199060.2DiedArchbishop of Kasama, Zambia

MicroData Summary for Elias White Mutale
Archbishop Elias White Mutale (born , died ) Archbishop of Kasama

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCikamutumba

  • a priest for 25.4 years
  • a bishop for 18.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 125

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 30 Jan 2018