Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop James Mwewa Spaita

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Kasama, Zambia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Apr 1934Born
9 Sep 196228.4Ordained PriestPriest of Mansa, Zambia
28 Feb 197439.8AppointedBishop of Mansa, Zambia
28 Apr 197440.0Ordained BishopBishop of Mansa, Zambia
3 Dec 199056.6AppointedArchbishop of Kasama, Zambia
30 Apr 200975.0RetiredArchbishop of Kasama, Zambia
4 Nov 201480.5DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Kasama, Zambia

MicroData Summary for James Mwewa Spaita (VIAF: 305026097)
Archbishop James Mwewa Spaita (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Kasama

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBombwe
Ordained BishopN.D. Assomption, Mansa, Diocese of Mansa

  • a priest for 52.1 years
  • a bishop for 40.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 4 May 2009
  • d: CB, 5 Nov 2014
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 221, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 25, Number 1,417

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast