Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop René-Georges Pailloux, M. Afr. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Mansa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Dec 1902BornParis, France
28 Jun 192825.5Ordained PriestPriest of Missionaries of Africa (White Fathers)
7 Nov 195249.9AppointedPrefect of Fort Rosebery, Zambia
3 Jan 196158.0AppointedBishop of Fort Rosebery, Zambia
18 Jun 196158.5Ordained BishopBishop of Fort Rosebery, Zambia
22 Nov 196764.9AppointedBishop of Mansa, Zambia
3 Jul 197168.5ResignedBishop of Mansa, Zambia
7 Dec 198885.9DiedBishop Emeritus of Mansa, Zambia

MicroData Summary for René-Georges Pailloux:
Bishop René-Georges Pailloux M. Afr. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Mansa

  • a priest for 60.4 years
  • a bishop for 27.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 190, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_b, v2.9.9, 5 Oct 2014; Data: 6 Nov 2014