Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Adrian Mung’andu

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Lusaka, Zambia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1920Born
29 Oct 195030.8Ordained PriestPriest of Lusaka, Zambia
18 Nov 197454.8AppointedBishop of Livingstone, Zambia
9 Feb 197555.1Ordained BishopBishop of Livingstone, Zambia
9 Jan 198464.0AppointedArchbishop of Lusaka, Zambia
30 Nov 199676.9RetiredArchbishop of Lusaka, Zambia
25 Jun 200787.4DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Lusaka, Zambia

MicroData Summary for Adrian Mung’andu
Archbishop Adrian Mung’andu (born 1920, died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Lusaka

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKasisi
Ordained BishopChrist the King, Maramba, Diocese of Livingstone

  • a priest for 56.6 years
  • a bishop for 32.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 191, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 30, Number 1,708

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast