Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paul Lungu, S.J. †

Deceased

Bishop of Monze


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Oct 1946BornKabwe
5 Aug 197932.8Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
26 Nov 199145.1AppointedBishop of Monze, Zambia
15 Mar 199245.4Ordained BishopBishop of Monze, Zambia
29 Apr 199851.6DiedBishop of Monze, Zambia

MicroData Summary for Paul Lungu:
Bishop Paul Lungu S.J. (born , died ) Bishop of Monze

  • a priest for 18.7 years
  • a bishop for 6.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1995
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 130, Number 11,659
  • obp: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 131
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 154, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013