Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Evans Chinyama Chinyemba, O.M.I.

Bishop of Mongu, Zambia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Aug 1967 Born
5 Feb 199426.4ProfessedMember of Oblates of Mary Immaculate
6 Jan 199931.4Perpetual VowsMember of Oblates of Mary Immaculate
19 Aug 200033.0Ordained PriestPriest of Oblates of Mary Immaculate
15 Feb 201143.5AppointedBishop of Mongu, Zambia
28 May 201143.8Ordained BishopBishop of Mongu, Zambia

MicroData Summary for Evans Chinyama Chinyemba
Bishop Evans Chinyama Chinyemba O.M.I. (born ) Bishop of Mongu

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLukulu

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Mongu.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 15 Feb 2011
  • ob/c2+: CB, 16 Apr 2011
  • c2: CB, 29 May 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 206, Number 17,065
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 215, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018