Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Marcello Zago, O.M.I. †

Deceased

Secretary of the Congregation for the Evangelization of Peoples

Titular Archbishop of Rusellae


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Aug 1932BornVillorba, Italy
13 Sep 195927.1Ordained PriestPriest of Oblates of Mary Immaculate
28 Mar 199865.6AppointedTitular Archbishop of Rusellae
28 Mar 199865.6AppointedSecretary of the Congregation for the Evangelization of Peoples
25 Apr 199865.7Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Rusellae
1 Mar 200168.6DiedSecretary of the Congregation for the Evangelization of Peoples

MicroData Summary for Marcello Zago:
Archbishop Marcello Zago O.M.I. (born , died ) Secretary of Evangelization of Peoples

  • a priest for 41.5 years
  • a bishop for 2.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 151, Number 13,271
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 166, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_b, v2.9.9, 5 Oct 2014; Data: 9 Oct 2014