Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Alberto Bottari de Castello

Apostolic Nuncio to Hungary

Titular Archbishop of Opitergium


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Jul 1942 BornMontebelluna, Italy
11 Sep 196624.1Ordained PriestPriest of Treviso, Italy
18 Dec 199957.4AppointedTitular Archbishop of Foratiana
18 Dec 199957.4AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Gambia
18 Dec 199957.4AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Guinea
18 Dec 199957.4AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Liberia
18 Dec 199957.4AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Sierra Leone
6 Jan 200057.5Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Foratiana
1 Apr 200562.7AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Japan
8 Dec 200765.4AppointedTitular Archbishop of Opitergium
6 Jun 201168.9AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Hungary

MicroData Summary for Alberto Bottari de Castello:
Archbishop Alberto Bottari de Castello (born ) Apostolic Nuncio of Hungary

Please contact the Archbishop through the Nunciature to Hungary.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: CB, 29 Jan 2008
  • ab: Bollettino, 6 Jun 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 157, Number 13,662

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015