Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Eijiro Suwa

Bishop of Takamatsu, Japan


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Jul 1947 Born
26 Nov 197629.3Ordained PriestPriest of Osaka, Japan
25 Mar 201163.7AppointedBishop of Takamatsu, Japan
19 Jun 201163.9Ordained BishopBishop of Takamatsu, Japan

MicroData Summary for John Eijiro Suwa
Bishop John Eijiro Suwa (born ) Bishop of Takamatsu

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKobe

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Takamatsu.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 25 Mar 2011
  • ob/c2+: CB, 20 Jun 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 206, Number 17,078

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018