Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francis Xavier Osamu Mizobe, S.D.B. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Takamatsu, Japan


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Mar 1935Born
9 Feb 196428.9Ordained PriestPriest of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
10 May 200065.1AppointedBishop of Sendai, Japan
9 Sep 200065.5Ordained BishopBishop of Sendai, Japan
14 May 200469.1AppointedBishop of Takamatsu, Japan
19 Jul 200469.3InstalledBishop of Takamatsu, Japan
25 Mar 201176.0RetiredBishop of Takamatsu, Japan
29 Feb 201680.9DiedBishop Emeritus of Takamatsu, Japan

MicroData Summary for Francis Xavier Osamu Mizobe (VIAF: 56471424)
Bishop Francis Xavier Osamu Mizobe S.D.B. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Takamatsu

EventPlace
Birth PlaceShingishu

  • a priest for 52.0 years
  • a bishop for 15.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 25 Mar 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 160, Number 13,832
  • d: CB, 1 Mar 2016
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 230, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 16 Jan 2017