Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Niigata

Dioecesis Niigataensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Tarcisio Isao Kikuchi, S.V.D., Bishop

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Elevated: 16 April 1962
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Tokyo
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Japan
  • Square Kilometers: 33,517 (12,945 Square Miles)
  • Official Web Site: http://www.niigata.catholic.jp/
  • Mailing Address: 656 Ichiban-cho, Higashi Ohata-dori, Niigata-shi, Niigata-ken 951-8106, Japan
  • Telephone: (025)222-7457
  • Fax: 222-7467

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Prefecture Apostolic of Niigata
13 August 1912ErectedDiocese of Hakodate Prefecture Apostolic of Niigata (erected)
18 February 1922Territory LostPrefecture Apostolic of Niigata
Archdiocese of Tokyo
Prefecture Apostolic of Nagoya (erected)
Diocese of Niigata
16 April 1962ElevatedPrefecture Apostolic of Niigata Diocese of Niigata

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Prefecture Apostolic of Niigata
19502,6135,070,000.1%3172013057ap1951
Diocese of Niigata
19706,7624,908,821.1%13344714335115ap1971
19807,0924,929,000.1%1530451573013428ap1981
19907,2464,974,487.1%1422362012212535ap1991
19997,5704,945,803.2%141933229199935ap2000
20007,5024,932,156.2%151833227189734ap2001
20017,5674,908,788.2%15183322911910134ap2002
20027,6744,893,401.2%1519342251209836ap2003
20037,5494,893,401.2%1519342221209937ap2004
20047,7114,850,802.2%1520352201219637ap2005

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2011
code: v2.7.5, 23 Nov 2011; data: 3 Dec 2011