Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Anton Ceska, S.V.D. †

Deceased

Prefect of Niigata, Japan


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Dec 1877Born
24 Feb 190527.2Ordained PriestPriest of Society of the Divine Word
28 Jun 192648.5AppointedPrefect of Niigata, Japan
194163.0DiedPrefect of Niigata, Japan

MicroData Summary for Anton Ceska
Father Anton Ceska S.V.D. (born , died 1941) Prefect of Niigata

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMattuglie, Austria

  • a priest for 35.8 years

Source(s):
  • b: JPG

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast