Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Tarcisio Isao Kikuchi, S.V.D.

Archbishop of Tōkyō, Japan

Apostolic Administrator of Niigata


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Nov 1958 Born
Mar 198526.3ProfessedMember of Society of the Divine Word
15 Mar 198627.3Ordained PriestPriest of Society of the Divine Word
29 Apr 200445.4AppointedBishop of Niigata, Japan
20 Sep 200445.8Ordained BishopBishop of Niigata, Japan
25 Oct 201758.9AppointedArchbishop of Tōkyō, Japan
16 Dec 201759.1InstalledArchbishop of Tōkyō, Japan
16 Dec 201759.1AppointedApostolic Administrator of Niigata, Japan

MicroData Summary for Tarcisio Isao Kikuchi (VIAF: 251543220)
Archbishop Tarcisio Isao Kikuchi S.V.D. (born ) Archbishop of Tōkyō

EventPlace
Birth PlaceIwate
Ordained Bishopsalle de Seishin Girls` High School, Niigata, Diocese of Niigata

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Tōkyō.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 176, Number 14,689
  • ab: Bollettino, 25 Oct 2017
  • i/ab: CB, 16 Dec 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.1, 12 Sep 2018; Data: 25 Sep 2018

Quantcast