Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Marcellino Taiji Tani

Bishop Emeritus of Saitama


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Feb 1953 BornKansai
21 Mar 198633.1Ordained PriestPriest of Urawa, Japan
10 May 200047.2AppointedBishop of Urawa, Japan
15 Sep 200047.6Ordained BishopBishop of Urawa, Japan
27 Jul 201360.5ResignedBishop of Saitama, Japan

MicroData Summary for Marcellino Taiji Tani:
Bishop Marcellino Taiji Tani (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Saitama

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Saitama.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 160, Number 13,837
  • r: Bollettino, 27 Jul 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013