Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francis Keiichi Sato, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Niigata


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Apr 1928BornAsahikawa
17 Sep 195931.4ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Minor
7 Oct 196234.5Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
9 Mar 198556.9AppointedBishop of Niigata, Japan
9 Jun 198557.2Ordained BishopBishop of Niigata, Japan
14 May 200476.1RetiredBishop of Niigata, Japan
2 Jan 200576.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Niigata, Japan

MicroData Summary for Francis Keiichi Sato:
Bishop Francis Keiichi Sato O.F.M. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Niigata

  • a priest for 42.2 years
  • a bishop for 19.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 183, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 200, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013