Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Shojiro Ito

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Niigata


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Mar 1909BornAkita
21 Mar 193829.0Ordained PriestPriest of Niigata, Japan
16 Apr 196253.0AppointedBishop of Niigata, Japan
14 Jun 196253.2Ordained BishopBishop of Niigata, Japan
9 Mar 198575.9RetiredBishop of Niigata, Japan
14 Mar 199384.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Niigata, Japan

MicroData Summary for John Shojiro Ito:
Bishop John Shojiro Ito (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Niigata

  • a priest for 54.9 years
  • a bishop for 30.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 137, Necrology (back)
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1962, Number 77

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015