Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Lucas Katsusaburo Arai

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Yokohama, Japan


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Oct 1904Born
28 Jun 193025.6Ordained PriestPriest
13 Dec 195147.1AppointedBishop of Yokohama, Japan
24 Feb 195247.3Ordained BishopBishop of Yokohama, Japan
30 Oct 197975.0RetiredBishop of Yokohama, Japan
25 Jul 199085.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Yokohama, Japan

MicroData Summary for Lucas Katsusaburo Arai
Bishop Lucas Katsusaburo Arai (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Yokohama

EventPlace
Birth PlaceUtsunomiya

  • a priest for 60.0 years
  • a bishop for 38.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 111
  • c2+: CB
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,991, Page 749
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 154, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1,952, Number 13

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast