Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Stephen Fumio Cardinal Hamao

Deceased

President Emeritus of the Pontifical Council for Pastoral Care of Migrants and Itinerant People

Cardinal-Deacon of San Giovanni Bosco in via Tuscolana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Mar 1930BornTokyo
21 Dec 195727.7Ordained PriestPriest
5 Feb 197039.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Tōkyō, Japan
5 Feb 197039.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Oreto
29 Apr 197040.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Oreto
30 Oct 197949.6AppointedBishop of Yokohama, Japan
15 Jun 199868.2ResignedBishop of Yokohama, Japan
15 Jun 199868.2AppointedPresident of the Pontifical Council for Pastoral Care of Migrants and Itinerant People
21 Oct 200373.6Elevated to Cardinal
21 Oct 200373.6AppointedCardinal-Deacon of San Giovanni Bosco in via Tuscolana
2 Apr 200575.0CeasedPresident of the Pontifical Council for Pastoral Care of Migrants and Itinerant People
21 Apr 200575.1ConfirmedPresident of the Pontifical Council for Pastoral Care of Migrants and Itinerant People
11 Mar 200676.0RetiredPresident of the Pontifical Council for Pastoral Care of Migrants and Itinerant People
8 Nov 200777.6DiedPresident Emeritus of the Pontifical Council for Pastoral Care of Migrants and Itinerant People

MicroData Summary for Stephen Fumio Hamao:
Stephen Fumio Cardinal Hamao (born , died ) President Emeritus of Pastoral Care of Migrants and Itinerant People

  • a priest for 49.8 years
  • a bishop for 37.5 years
  • a cardinal for 4.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 11 Mar 2006
  • d: CB
  • ob/c2/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 191, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 191, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015