Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Rafael Masahiro Umemura

Bishop of Yokohama


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Jun 1952 BornYokohama
25 Mar 198532.8Ordained PriestPriest of Yokohama, Japan
16 Mar 199946.8AppointedBishop of Yokohama, Japan
15 May 199946.9Ordained BishopBishop of Yokohama, Japan

MicroData Summary for Rafael Masahiro Umemura:
Bishop Rafael Masahiro Umemura (born ) Bishop of Yokohama

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Yokohama.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 155, Number 13,554
  • c34: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 156, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 200, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013