Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Laurentius Satoshi Nagae

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Urawa, Japan


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Aug 1913Born
19 Mar 193824.5Ordained PriestPriest
24 Dec 195744.3AppointedBishop of Urawa, Japan
13 Apr 195844.6Ordained BishopBishop of Urawa, Japan
20 Dec 197966.3ResignedBishop of Urawa, Japan
11 Feb 199884.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Urawa, Japan

MicroData Summary for Laurentius Satoshi Nagae
Bishop Laurentius Satoshi Nagae (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Urawa

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTokyo

  • a priest for 59.8 years
  • a bishop for 39.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 111
  • c2+: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 154, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018