Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Peter Tatsuo Cardinal Doi

Deceased

Archbishop of Tōkyō, Japan

Cardinal-Priest of Sant’Antonio da Padova in Via Merulana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Dec 1892Born
1 May 192128.3Ordained PriestPriest of Hakodate, Japan
2 Dec 193744.9AppointedArchbishop of Tōkyō, Japan
13 Feb 193845.1Ordained BishopArchbishop of Tōkyō, Japan
28 Mar 196067.2Elevated to Cardinal
28 Mar 196067.2AppointedCardinal-Priest of Sant’Antonio da Padova in Via Merulana
21 Feb 197077.1DiedArchbishop of Tōkyō, Japan

MicroData Summary for Peter Tatsuo Doi
Peter Tatsuo Cardinal Doi (born , died ) Archbishop of Tōkyō

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSendai

  • a priest for 48.8 years
  • a bishop for 32.0 years
  • a cardinal for 9.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1938, Number 8

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast