Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Sendai

Dioecesis Sendaiensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Martin Tetsuo Hiraga, Bishop

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Name Changed: 9 March 1936
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Tokyo
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Japan
  • Square Kilometers: 45,953 (17,749 Square Miles)
  • Official Web Site: http://www.sendai.catholic.jp/
  • Mailing Address: Chancery Office, Honcho 1-2-12, Aoba-ku, Sendai-shi, Miyahi-ken 980-0014, Japan
  • Telephone: (022)222-7371
  • Fax: 222-7378

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Hakodate
17 April 1891ErectedDiocese of Hakodate (erected)
13 August 1912Territory LostDiocese of Hakodate Prefecture Apostolic of Niigata (erected)
12 February 1915Territory LostDiocese of Hakodate Prefecture Apostolic of Sapporo (erected)
Diocese of Sendai
9 March 1936Name ChangedDiocese of Hakodate Diocese of Sendai

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Sendai
19505,6776,635,317.1%2131521093629922ap1951
196912,5416,557,000.2%2713403131833752ap1971
198012,3367,013,198.2%2953821506033457ap1981
199011,8167,255,210.2%2747741595231957ap1991
199911,1727,396,081.2%2933621803731167ap2000
200010,8727,393,347.1%2837651674130067ap2001
200110,8697,386,346.1%2633591843730767ap2002
200210,8877,380,697.1%2430542013330356ap2003
200310,9367,364,591.1%2328512143128856ap2004
200410,9477,332,874.1%2723502182928956ap2005
201010,9497,167,150.2%2217392802425853ap2011

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2012
code: v2.8.0, 29 Jul 2012; data: 1 Sep 2012