Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Petro Arikata Kobayashi

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Sendai, Japan


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Sep 1909Born
21 Mar 193525.4Ordained PriestPriest of Osaka, Japan
21 Feb 195444.4AppointedBishop of Sendai, Japan
3 May 195444.6Ordained BishopBishop of Sendai, Japan
24 Jan 197666.3ResignedBishop of Sendai, Japan
31 Jul 199989.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Sendai, Japan

MicroData Summary for Petro Arikata Kobayashi
Bishop Petro Arikata Kobayashi (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Sendai

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKobe

  • a priest for 64.3 years
  • a bishop for 45.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 111
  • c3+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1954
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 158, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018