Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Sapporo

Dioecesis Sapporensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Bernard Taiji Katsuya, Bishop
  • Peter Toshio Jinushi, Bishop Emeritus

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Elevated: 11 December 1952
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Tōkyō
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Japan
  • Square Kilometers: 83,452 (32,233 Square Miles)
  • Official Web Site: http://www.csd.or.jp/
  • Mailing Address: Catholic Bishop's Office, Higashi 6-chome 10, Kita 1-jo, Chuo-ku, Sapporo-shi 060-0031, Japan
  • Telephone: (011)241.2785
  • Fax: 221-3668

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Prefecture Apostolic of Sapporo
12 February 1915ErectedDiocese of Hakodate Prefecture Apostolic of Sapporo (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Sapporo
30 March 1929ElevatedPrefecture Apostolic of Sapporo Vicariate Apostolic of Sapporo
18 July 1932Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Sapporo Mission "Sui Iuris" of Karafuto (erected)
Diocese of Sapporo
11 December 1952ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Sapporo Diocese of Sapporo

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Vicariate Apostolic of Sapporo
19505,5063,600,000.2%10152522089021ap1951
Diocese of Sapporo
197017,0205,200,000.3%124912157914042370ap1971
198017,4845,567,573.3%328111315413342170ap1981
199016,9745,687,825.3%3359921849237671ap1991
199917,3505,736,812.3%4235772256737268ap2000
200017,4845,726,184.3%4138792216936468ap2001
200117,4845,726,184.3%4034742366535168ap2002
200217,5945,720,284.3%3936752346534968ap2003
200317,7445,682,950.3%3936752366935168ap2004
200417,7635,690,493.3%2245672657233668ap2005
201017,9935,543,556.3%2045652766930159ap2011

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 14 Oct 2013