Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Michael Wasaburo Urakawa

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Sendai, Japan

Titular Bishop of Attalea in Pamphylia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Apr 1876Born
1 Jul 190630.2Ordained PriestPriest of Nagasaki, Japan
20 Nov 194165.6AppointedBishop of Sendai, Japan
18 Jan 194265.7Ordained BishopBishop of Sendai, Japan
26 Nov 195377.6RetiredBishop of Sendai, Japan
26 Nov 195377.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Attalea in Pamphylia
24 Nov 195579.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Sendai, Japan

MicroData Summary for Michael Wasaburo Urakawa
Bishop Michael Wasaburo Urakawa (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Sendai

EventPlace
Birth PlaceUrakami

  • a priest for 49.3 years
  • a bishop for 13.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1942, Number 4

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018