Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Dominic Senyemon Fukahori

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Fukuoka, Japan


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Jun 1894Born
1 Jul 193642.0Ordained PriestPriest
16 Jan 194146.5AppointedApostolic Administrator of Fukuoka, Japan
9 Mar 194449.7AppointedBishop of Fukuoka, Japan
28 May 194449.9Ordained BishopBishop of Fukuoka, Japan
18 Nov 194551.4AppointedApostolic Administrator of Miyazaki, Japan
22 Dec 196167.5CeasedApostolic Administrator of Miyazaki, Japan
15 Nov 196975.4RetiredBishop of Fukuoka, Japan
15 Nov 196975.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Crepedula
9 Aug 197682.1ResignedTitular Bishop of Crepedula
21 Jun 198591.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Fukuoka, Japan

MicroData Summary for Dominic Senyemon Fukahori
Bishop Dominic Senyemon Fukahori (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Fukuoka

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNagasaki

  • a priest for 48.9 years
  • a bishop for 41.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1944, Number 26

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018