Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Peter Takaaki Hirayama

Bishop Emeritus of Oita, Japan


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Mar 1924 Born
19 Mar 195732.9Ordained PriestPriest of Fukuoka, Japan
15 Nov 196945.6AppointedBishop of Oita, Japan
25 Jan 197045.8Ordained BishopBishop of Oita, Japan
10 May 200076.1RetiredBishop of Oita, Japan

MicroData Summary for Peter Takaaki Hirayama
Bishop Peter Takaaki Hirayama (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Oita

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSeoul
Ordained BishopSt. Francis Xavier, Church, Oita, Diocese of Oita

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Oita.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 10, Number 491

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast