Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Dominic Ryōji Miyahara

Bishop of Fukuoka


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 May 1955 BornGoto
19 Mar 198226.8Ordained PriestPriest
10 May 200045.0AppointedBishop of Oita, Japan
1 Oct 200045.4Ordained BishopBishop of Oita, Japan
19 Mar 200852.8AppointedBishop of Fukuoka, Japan

MicroData Summary for Dominic Ryōji Miyahara:
Bishop Dominic Ryōji Miyahara (born ) Bishop of Fukuoka

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Fukuoka.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 19 Mar 2008
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 161, Number 13,849

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013