Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paul Shinichi Itonaga

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Kagoshima


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Jul 1928BornHiroda
14 Sep 195224.1Ordained PriestPriest
15 Nov 196941.3AppointedBishop of Kagoshima, Japan
18 Jan 197041.4Ordained BishopBishop of Kagoshima, Japan
3 Dec 200577.3RetiredBishop of Kagoshima, Japan
10 Dec 201688.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Kagoshima, Japan

MicroData Summary for Paul Shinichi Itonaga (VIAF: 259440570)
Bishop Paul Shinichi Itonaga (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Kagoshima

  • a priest for 64.2 years
  • a bishop for 46.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 3 Dec 2005
  • d: CB, 15 Dec 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 16 Dec 2016