Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Peter Baptist Tadamaro Ishigami, O.F.M. Cap. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Naha, Japan


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Dec 1920Born
6 Sep 195231.7Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
18 Dec 197252.0AppointedBishop of Naha, Japan
11 Feb 197352.1Ordained BishopBishop of Naha, Japan
24 Jan 199776.1RetiredBishop of Naha, Japan
25 Oct 201493.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Naha, Japan

MicroData Summary for Peter Baptist Tadamaro Ishigami
Bishop Peter Baptist Tadamaro Ishigami O.F.M. Cap. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Naha

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKasari

  • a priest for 62.1 years
  • a bishop for 41.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 221, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.7, 12 Sep 2017; Data: 11 Dec 2017