Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Anthony Sablan Apuron, O.F.M. Cap.

Archbishop Emeritus of Agaña, Guam, Pacific (Oceania)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Nov 1945 Born
31 Jul 196418.7EnteredMember of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
1 Sep 196519.8ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
1 Sep 196822.8Solemn VowsMember of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
12 Dec 197126.1Ordained DeaconDeacon of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
26 Aug 197226.8Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
8 Dec 198338.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Agaña, Guam, Pacific (Oceania)
8 Dec 198338.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Muzuca in Byzacena
19 Feb 198438.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Muzuca in Byzacena
27 Oct 198539.9AppointedApostolic Administrator of Agaña, Guam, Pacific (Oceania)
10 Mar 198640.3AppointedArchbishop of Agaña, Guam, Pacific (Oceania)
11 May 198640.5InstalledArchbishop of Agaña, Guam, Pacific (Oceania)
4 Apr 201973.4RemovedArchbishop of Agaña, Guam, Pacific (Oceania)

MicroData Summary for Anthony Sablan Apuron (VIAF: 46365033)
Archbishop Anthony Sablan Apuron O.F.M. Cap. (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Agaña

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAgaña, Vicariate Apostolic of Guam
Ordained DeaconDulce Nombre de Maria, Cathedral, Agaña, Diocese of Agaña, Guam
Ordained PriestDulce Nombre de Maria, Cathedral, Agaña, Diocese of Agaña, Guam
Ordained BishopDulce Nombre de Maria, Cathedral, Agaña, Diocese of Agaña, Guam

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Agaña.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • prof/c01/loc: CB, 16 Jan 2019
  • r: Bollettino, 4 Apr 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 4 Apr 2019

Quantcast