Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Agaña

Archidioecesis Aganiensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Anthony Sablan Apuron, O.F.M. Cap., Archbishop

Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 8 March 1984
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Guam
  • Region: Pacific (Oceania)
  • Square Kilometers: 557 (215 Square Miles)
  • Catholic Directory Abbreviation: AGN
  • Official Web Site: http://www.archdioceseofagana.com/
  • Mailing Address: Chancery Office, 196B Cuesta San Ramon, Hagatna, Guam 96910, Oceania
  • Telephone: (671)472-6116
  • Fax: 477-3519

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Vicariate Apostolic of Guam
1 March 1911ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Guam (erected)
4 July 1946Territory AddedVicariate Apostolic of Marianne, Caroline, and Marshall Islands Vicariate Apostolic of Caroline and Marshall Islands (Name Changed and Territory Lost)
Vicariate Apostolic of Guam
Diocese of Agaña
14 October 1965ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Guam Diocese of Agaña
Archdiocese of Agaña
8 March 1984ElevatedDiocese of Agaña Archdiocese of Agaña
8 November 1984Territory LostArchdiocese of Agaña Diocese of Chalan Kanoa (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Vicariate Apostolic of Guam
195032,20932,70098.5%324271,1924412017ap1951
Diocese of Agaña
196660,04662,24096.5%1526411,4641820624ap1967
197080,872115,00070.3%2355781,0365721324ap1971
1976111,831141,87178.8%2628542,070183614831ap1977
1980120,659129,42893.2%1932512,365114314635ap1981
Archdiocese of Agaña
1990114,404126,16990.7%1927462,48752914326ap1991
1999122,962144,97784.8%2815432,85992012024ap2000
2000122,962144,86784.9%2710373,32391512024ap2001
2001150,563167,29290.0%3116473,20372212524ap2002
2002125,167154,80580.9%335383,29392112024ap2003
2003131,430154,62385.0%3215472,79682112024ap2004
2004131,584154,80585.0%3215472,799201612024ap2005
2006132,494155,68785.1%3012423,154201210324ap2007
2012157,000184,00085.3%389473,34017910024ap2013

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.1, 20 Jul 2013; data: 17 Aug 2013