Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Michael Jude Byrnes

Coadjutor Archbishop of Agaņa, Guam


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Aug 1958 BornDetroit
25 May 199637.7Ordained PriestPriest of Detroit, Michigan, USA
22 Mar 201152.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Detroit, Michigan, USA
22 Mar 201152.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Eguga
5 May 201152.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Eguga
31 Oct 201658.1AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Agaņa, Guam, Pacific (Oceania)
30 Nov 201658.2InstalledCoadjutor Archbishop of Agaņa, Guam, Pacific (Oceania)

MicroData Summary for Michael Jude Byrnes (VIAF: 259333982)
Archbishop Michael Jude Byrnes (born ) Coadjutor Archbishop of Agaņa

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Agaņa.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 22 Mar 2011
  • ob/c2+: CB, 25 Apr 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 206, Number 17,049
  • ab: Bollettino, 31 Oct 2016
  • i: CB, 14 Nov 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 14 Nov 2016