Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Allen Henry Vigneron

Archbishop of Detroit, Michigan

Superior of Cayman Islands


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Oct 1948 BornMount Clemens
26 Jul 197526.8Ordained PriestPriest of Detroit, Michigan, USA
12 Jun 199647.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Detroit, Michigan, USA
12 Jun 199647.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Sault Sainte Marie in Michigan
9 Jul 199647.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sault Sainte Marie in Michigan
10 Jan 200354.2AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Oakland, California, USA
26 Feb 200354.3InstalledCoadjutor Bishop of Oakland, California, USA
1 Oct 200354.9SucceededBishop of Oakland, California, USA
5 Jan 200960.2AppointedArchbishop of Detroit, Michigan, USA
5 Jan 200960.2AppointedSuperior of Cayman Islands, Antilles
28 Jan 200960.3InstalledArchbishop of Detroit, Michigan, USA

MicroData Summary for Allen Henry Vigneron:
Archbishop Allen Henry Vigneron (born ) Archbishop of Detroit

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Detroit.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 5 Jan 2009
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 146, Number 12,772

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.7, 12 Jan 2014; data: 16 Jan 2014