Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gerard William Battersby

Auxiliary Bishop of Detroit, Michigan, USA

Titular Bishop of Eguga


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 May 1960 Born
30 May 199838.0Ordained PriestPriest of Detroit, Michigan, USA
23 Nov 201656.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Detroit, Michigan, USA
23 Nov 201656.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Eguga
25 Jan 201756.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Eguga

MicroData Summary for Gerard William Battersby
Bishop Gerard William Battersby (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Detroit

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDetroit, Archdiocese of Detroit, Michigan
Ordained BishopMost Blessed Sacrament, Cathedral, Detroit, Archdiocese of Detroit, Michigan

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Detroit.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 23 Nov 2016
  • mn/ob: Website of the Diocese, 23 Nov 2016
  • c34: CB, 9 Jan 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 27 Jan 2017