Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Robert John McClory

Bishop of Gary, Indiana, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Oct 1963 Born
8 Oct 199834.9Ordained DeaconDeacon of Detroit, Michigan, USA
22 May 199935.6Ordained PriestPriest of Detroit, Michigan, USA
26 Nov 201956.1AppointedBishop of Gary, Indiana, USA
11 Feb 202056.3Ordained BishopBishop of Gary, Indiana, USA

MicroData Summary for Robert John McClory
Bishop Robert John McClory (born ) Bishop of Gary

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDetroit, Archdiocese of Detroit, Michigan
Ordained DeaconSan Pietro, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Ordained PriestBlessed Sacrament, Cathedral, Detroit, Archdiocese of Detroit, Michigan
Ordained BishopHoly Angels, Cathedral, Gary, Diocese of Gary, Indiana

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Gary.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 26 Nov 2019
  • ob: CB, 26 Nov 2019
  • od/c01: CB, 29 Jan 2019
  • c2: CB, 4 Feb 2020
  • c34: CB, 8 Feb 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 11 Feb 2020

Quantcast