Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Edmund Casimir Cardinal Szoka

Deceased

President Emeritus of the Governatorate of Vatican City State

Cardinal-Priest of Santi Andrea e Gregorio al Monte Celio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Sep 1927BornGrand Rapids
5 Jun 195426.7Ordained PriestPriest of Marquette, Michigan, USA
11 Jun 197143.7AppointedBishop of Gaylord, Michigan, USA
20 Jul 197143.8Ordained BishopBishop of Gaylord, Michigan, USA
28 Mar 198153.5AppointedArchbishop of Detroit, Michigan, USA
17 May 198153.7InstalledArchbishop of Detroit, Michigan, USA
28 Jun 198860.8Elevated to Cardinal
28 Jun 198860.8AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santi Andrea e Gregorio al Monte Celio
28 Apr 199062.6AppointedPresident of the Prefecture for the Economic Affairs of the Holy See
15 Oct 199770.1AppointedPresident of the Governatorate of Vatican City State
22 Feb 200173.4AppointedPresident of the Pontifical Commission for Vatican City State
15 Sep 200679.0RetiredPresident of the Governatorate of Vatican City State
15 Sep 200679.0RetiredPresident of the Pontifical Commission for Vatican City State
20 Aug 201486.9DiedPresident Emeritus of the Governatorate of Vatican City State

MicroData Summary for Edmund Casimir Szoka:
Edmund Casimir Cardinal Szoka (born , died ) President Emeritus of Governatorate of Vatican City State

  • a priest for 60.2 years
  • a bishop for 43.1 years
  • a cardinal for 26.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 22 Jun 2006
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 110, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: CB, 21 Aug 2014
  • ob/c2/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 220, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_b, v3.0.0, 8 Nov 2014; Data: 24 Nov 2014