Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Thomas Lawrence Noa

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Marquette, Michigan


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Dec 1892BornIron Mountain, MI
23 Dec 191624.0Ordained PriestPriest
22 Feb 194653.1AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Sioux City, Iowa, USA
22 Feb 194653.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Salona
19 Mar 194653.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Salona
20 Aug 194754.6AppointedBishop of Marquette, Michigan, USA
5 Jan 196875.0RetiredBishop of Marquette, Michigan, USA
5 Jan 196875.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Talaptula
31 Dec 197078.0ResignedTitular Bishop of Talaptula
13 Mar 197784.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Marquette, Michigan, USA

MicroData Summary for Thomas Lawrence Noa:
Bishop Thomas Lawrence Noa (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Marquette

  • a priest for 60.2 years
  • a bishop for 30.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1946, Number 16

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015