Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop John Clayton Nienstedt

Archbishop of Saint Paul and Minneapolis, Minnesota


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Mar 1947 BornDetroit
27 Jul 197427.4Ordained PriestPriest of Detroit, Michigan, USA
12 Jun 199649.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Detroit, Michigan, USA
12 Jun 199649.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Alton
9 Jul 199649.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Alton
12 Jun 200154.2AppointedBishop of New Ulm, Minnesota, USA
6 Aug 200154.4InstalledBishop of New Ulm, Minnesota, USA
24 Apr 200760.1AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Saint Paul and Minneapolis, Minnesota, USA
2 May 200861.1SucceededArchbishop of Saint Paul and Minneapolis, Minnesota, USA

MicroData Summary for John Clayton Nienstedt:
Archbishop John Clayton Nienstedt (born ) Archbishop of Saint Paul and Minneapolis

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Saint Paul and Minneapolis.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 24 Apr 2007
  • s: Bollettino, 2 May 2008
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 146, Number 12,771

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.4, 11 Nov 2013; data: 18 Dec 2013